Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola-Maria Laudisio, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1779³BornSarno
2 Feb 180121.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
4 Jun 180324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 Apr 181940.0SelectedBishop of Bova, Italy
4 Jun 181940.2ConfirmedBishop of Bova, Italy
6 Jun 181940.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
22 Mar 182445.0SelectedBishop of Policastro, Italy
3 May 182445.1ConfirmedBishop of Policastro, Italy
6 Jan 186282.8DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola-Maria Laudisio:
Bishop Nicola-Maria Laudisio C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Policastro

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 116, and Page 311
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013