Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Barretta, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1759BornNapoli
22 Dec 178122.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
21 Sep 178222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
20 Mar 181858.3SelectedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
26 Jun 181858.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
28 Jun 181858.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
7 Jun 181959.5ResignedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
7 Oct 183575.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Barretta:
Archbishop Antonio Barretta C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013