Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Tomasuolo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicotera e Tropea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1773BornNapoli
1 Apr 179724.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 181845.6SelectedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
21 Dec 181845.7ConfirmedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
27 Dec 181845.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
21 Jun 182451.2ResignedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Tomasuolo
Bishop Giovanni Battista Tomasuolo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicotera e Tropea

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 283
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1818, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016