Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Puoti

Deceased

Bishop of Alife, Italy

Archbishop (Personal Title) of Telese o Cerreto Sannita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1763³Born
20 Mar 181854.7SelectedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
6 Apr 181854.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
12 Apr 181854.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
3 Jun 182662.9SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Alife, Italy
3 Jun 182662.9SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
3 Jul 182663.0ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Alife, Italy
3 Jul 182663.0ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
14 Mar 184884.7DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Puoti
Archbishop Carlo Puoti (born , died ) Bishop of Alife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 68, and Page 325
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1818, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018