Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Mancini

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1777BornFirenze
1 Mar 180628.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 181841.0AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
4 Oct 181841.0Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
12 Jul 182446.8AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
15 Feb 185577.4DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Mancini
Archbishop Giuseppe Mancini (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 256, and Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1818, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016