Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luc Antonio Colomboni Accoramboni

Deceased

Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1666Born
18 Nov 169125.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 171144.5AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
1 Sep 173568.8DiedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luc Antonio Colomboni Accoramboni
Bishop Luc Antonio Colomboni Accoramboni (born , died ) Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGubbio

  • a priest for 43.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1733
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 273
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018