Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Francesco Maria Ferraris da Genola

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1745BornTurino
10 Mar 177024.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 177832.4SelectedBishop of Susa, Italy
20 Jul 177832.7ConfirmedBishop of Susa, Italy
26 Jul 177832.7Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
2 Jun 180054.6SelectedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
11 Aug 180054.8ConfirmedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
19 Oct 180054.9DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Francesco Maria Ferraris da Genola:
Bishop Giuseppe Francesco Maria Ferraris da Genola (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 371
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1801
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 331
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015