Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo d’Ambrosio

Deceased

Bishop of Larino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1728Born
18 Sep 175123.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 177547.6AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
17 Sep 177547.6Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
16 Jul 179668.4DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo d’Ambrosio
Bishop Carlo d’Ambrosio (born , died ) Bishop of Larino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Severo

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 253
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,775, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast