Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Solari, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Noli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1742BornGenova
23 Mar 176523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Jun 177836.2AppointedBishop of Noli, Italy
7 Jun 177836.2Ordained BishopBishop of Noli, Italy
13 Apr 181472.0DiedBishop of Noli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Solari:
Bishop Benedetto Solari O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Noli

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1779
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 302
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015