Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Maria Gentile

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Savona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1732BornGenova
11 Apr 175725.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 177643.8AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
4 Feb 177643.8Ordained BishopBishop of Savona, Italy
24 Sep 180472.4ResignedBishop of Savona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Maria Gentile:
Bishop Domenico Maria Gentile (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Savona

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1783
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013