Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mattia Santoro

Deceased

Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1736BornBovino
10 Mar 175923.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 177539.6AppointedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
24 Sep 177539.6Ordained BishopBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
27 Nov 179761.8DiedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy

MicroData Summary for Mattia Santoro:
Bishop Mattia Santoro (born , died ) Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015