Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Lorenzo Massajoli

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1732BornGubbio
20 Sep 175523.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Sep 176836.1AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
29 Sep 176836.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
6 Oct 1800³68.1DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Lorenzo Massajoli:
Bishop Francesco Lorenzo Massajoli (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera Umbra

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015