Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Bernardino Pecci, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1724³Born
23 Dec 174723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Jun 177450.4AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
3 Jul 177450.4Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
1809¹84.9DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bernardino Pecci
Bishop Giuseppe Bernardino Pecci O.S.B. (born , died 1809) Bishop of Montalcino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena
Ordained BishopCathedral, Frascati, Suburbicarian See of Frascati

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 243
  • ob/c2: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 17
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Sep 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,045
  • c34: AT, 27 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast