Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vittorio Maria Baldassare Gaetano Cardinal Costa d’Arignano

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1737BornTurino
1 Mar 176022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
19 Jul 176932.3SelectedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
11 Sep 176932.5ConfirmedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
21 Sep 176932.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
9 Sep 177841.4SelectedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
28 Sep 177841.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
30 Mar 178952.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 179659.1DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Maria Baldassare Gaetano Costa d’Arignano: VIAF:5799792
Vittorio Maria Baldassare Gaetano Cardinal Costa d’Arignano (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
  • a cardinal for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Mar 1789
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015