Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie Paget

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1727Born
18 Sep 175124.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 178759.7SelectedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
23 Apr 178760.0ConfirmedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
27 May 178760.1Ordained BishopBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
4 Feb 180274.8ResignedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
23 Apr 1810³83.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Paget
Bishop Joseph-Marie Paget (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Genève {Geneva}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Julien en Genevois

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 224
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,500
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018