Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Corte

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1727BornDogliani
21 Apr 175325.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 177345.8AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
16 Sep 177345.8Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
5 Mar 178355.2SelectedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
18 Jul 178355.6ConfirmedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
25 Dec 180073.0DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Corte:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Corte (born , died ) Bishop of Mondovi

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 93, and Page 296
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013