Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Amedeo Vagnone

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1728Born
16 Jun 175324.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 176940.5SelectedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
11 Sep 176940.7ConfirmedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
21 Sep 176940.7Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
8 Dec 177041.9InstalledBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
30 Jan 177748.1ResignedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
1788²59.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Alba (Pompea), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Amedeo Vagnone
Bishop Giacinto Amedeo Vagnone (born , died 1788) Bishop Emeritus of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrofarello

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 73
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017