Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Conseil

Deceased

Bishop of Chambéry, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1716Born
2 Apr 174024.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 178063.8SelectedBishop of Chambéry, France
20 Mar 178064.0ConfirmedBishop of Chambéry, France
30 Apr 178064.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chambéry, France
27 Sep 179377.5DiedBishop of Chambéry, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Conseil
Bishop Michel Conseil (born , died ) Bishop of Chambéry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMegève

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,780, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 162

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast