Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Joseph Compans de Brichanteau

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1737BornTurino
13 Jun 176729.5Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 178042.1SelectedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
20 Mar 178042.2ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
23 Apr 178042.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
20 Jul 179658.6SelectedBishop of Acqui, Italy
25 Aug 179658.6DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Charles-Joseph Compans de Brichanteau:
Bishop Charles-Joseph Compans de Brichanteau (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 93, and Page 281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015