Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Giuseppe Cardinal Filippa della Martiniana

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1724BornTurin
1 Mar 174924.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 175732.9AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
7 Aug 175733.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
1 Jun 177853.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Apr 177954.8SelectedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
12 Jul 177955.0ConfirmedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
2 Apr 180075.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
7 Dec 180278.4DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giuseppe Filippa della Martiniana:
Carlo Giuseppe Cardinal Filippa della Martiniana (born , died ) Bishop of Vercelli

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
  • a cardinal for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1778
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016