Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Cusani di Saliano

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1735BornVercelli
31 May 176025.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 178348.2SelectedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
15 Dec 178348.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
18 Jan 178448.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
1796¹60.6DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Cusani di Saliano:
Archbishop Luigi Cusani di Saliano (born ) Archbishop of Oristano

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 96
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 14 Dec 2013