Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Ottavio Hercule Pochettini di Serravalle

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1735Born
9 Jun 175924.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 176934.2SelectedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
11 Sep 176934.3ConfirmedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
21 Sep 176934.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
20 Jun 180368.1DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Ottavio Hercule Pochettini di Serravalle
Bishop Giuseppe Ottavio Hercule Pochettini di Serravalle (born , died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRacconigi

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 245
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018