Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emidio Ziucci

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Damascus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1750³BornAscoli della Marca, Italy
1774¹23.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 179544.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
24 Aug 179544.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
9 Sep 179645.8ResignedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
16 Dec 179646.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
20 Apr 180251.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Damascus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emidio Ziucci (VIAF: 77490095)
Archbishop Emidio Ziucci (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Damascus

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 192, and Page 357
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016