Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacinto della Torre, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1747BornSaluzzo
10 Mar 177022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
2 Dec 178942.7SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
29 Mar 179043.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
2 May 179043.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
14 Jun 179750.2SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Acqui, Italy
24 Jul 179750.3ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Acqui, Italy
26 Jun 180558.2AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
8 Apr 181467.0DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto della Torre
Archbishop Giacinto della Torre O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 93, and Page 423
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 360
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016