Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Coppula

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1720Born
18 Mar 174727.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 177858.7AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
20 Dec 177858.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
16 Feb 178968.9DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Coppula
Bishop Giuseppe Coppula (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBronte

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,788
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,778, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast