Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Attaffi

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1706BornStignano
17 Dec 172923.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 177770.5AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
24 Jun 177770.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera, Italy
4 Mar 178477.3DiedBishop of Nicotera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Attaffi:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Attaffi (born , died ) Bishop of Nicotera

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015