Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Vincenzo Lajezza

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1732Born
20 Sep 175523.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 177644.4AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
21 Dec 177644.4Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
31 Oct 179260.2DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Vincenzo Lajezza
Bishop Francesco Vincenzo Lajezza (born , died ) Bishop of Marsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,776, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast