Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Donato Durante

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1707Born
25 Mar 173224.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 176860.4SelectedBishop of Ugento, Italy
19 Sep 176860.7ConfirmedBishop of Ugento, Italy
29 Sep 176860.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
10 Sep 178173.7DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Donato Durante
Bishop Giovanni Donato Durante (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLecce

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 424
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,768, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast