Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Scipione de’ Ricci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pistoia e Prato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1740BornFirenze
20 Sep 176626.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 178040.4AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
25 Jun 178040.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
13 Jun 179151.4ResignedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
27 Jan 181070.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Scipione de’ Ricci:
Bishop Scipione de’ Ricci (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pistoia e Prato

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013