Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Cervone

Deceased

Bishop of L’Aquila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1732³BornCampanien
8 Feb 175825.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 177644.7SelectedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
23 Jun 177745.3ConfirmedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
24 Jun 177745.3Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
31 Mar 178856.0DiedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Cervone:
Bishop Benedetto Cervone (born , died ) Bishop of L’Aquila

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013