Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Dandolfi (Landolfi)

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1722Born
24 Sep 174624.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 177552.5SelectedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
29 May 177552.6ConfirmedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
4 Jun 177552.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
21 Nov 178967.1DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Dandolfi (Landolfi)
Bishop Gerolamo Dandolfi (Landolfi) (born , died ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmalfi

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018