Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Alessandri

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1729Born
8 Jun 175425.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 177344.3AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
20 Jun 177344.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
20 May 177647.2AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
15 Apr 180273.1DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Alessandri
Bishop Gregorio Alessandri (born , died ) Bishop of Cortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Fiesole

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 184, and Page 388
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,773, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast