Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Pasquale Rogani

Deceased

Bishop of Trevico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1730BornCropalati
23 Sep 175222.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Jun 175322.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 May 177443.8AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
15 May 177443.8Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
21 Jun 179160.9DiedBishop of Trevico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pasquale Rogani:
Bishop Giuseppe Pasquale Rogani (born , died ) Bishop of Trevico

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Dec 2015