Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicola Cardinal Colonna di Stigliano

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1730BornNapoli, Italy
8 Apr 177645.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Apr 177645.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 177645.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
28 May 177645.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
14 Sep 177646.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
14 Feb 178554.5Elevated to Cardinal
13 Sep 178555.1CeasedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
24 Jul 178656.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
30 Mar 1796³65.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Colonna di Stigliano (VIAF: 89093249)
Nicola Cardinal Colonna di Stigliano (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

  • a priest for 19.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
  • a cardinal for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Feb 1785
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 18
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Nov 2016