Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gennaro Antonio Cardinal de Simone

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pesaro

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1714BornGinestra
15 Mar 177358.5Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 177358.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
13 Mar 177560.5AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
30 Apr 177560.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
18 Aug 177964.9ResignedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
16 Dec 178066.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Antonio de Simone:
Cardinal Gennaro Antonio de Simone (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pesaro

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
  • a cardinal for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1773

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013