Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Saverio Marini

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1728Born
27 Mar 175122.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 177951.4AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
26 Sep 177951.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
6 Jan 181384.7DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Saverio Marini
Bishop Saverio Marini (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

EventPlace
Birth PlacePesaro

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1796
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 354
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018