Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Angelelli

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1751Born
25 Mar 177422.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 178533.8AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
20 Feb 178533.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
6 Mar 180957.8DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Angelelli
Bishop Ottavio Angelelli (born , died ) Bishop of Gubbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018