Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Giacomo Filippo Luvini, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Giuseppe Maria de Lugano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1725³Born
9 Mar 174822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Feb 178559.8AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
20 Feb 178559.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
3 Sep 179065.4DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Giacomo Filippo Luvini (VIAF: 89167606)
Bishop Teodoro Giacomo Filippo Luvini O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLugano, Switzerland

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018