Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Colaianni

Deceased

Bishop of Sora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1751³BornBarisciano
3 Apr 177927.6Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179746.2SelectedBishop of Sora, Italy
18 Dec 179746.3ConfirmedBishop of Sora, Italy
21 Dec 179746.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
1814¹62.3DiedBishop of Sora, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Colaianni
Bishop Agostino Colaianni (born , died 1814) Bishop of Sora

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016