Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Carenzi, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1808AppointedBishop of Bacău, Romania
31 Dec 1808Ordained BishopBishop of Bacău, Romania
26 Sep 1814AppointedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
13 Nov 1817DiedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Carenzi
Bishop Bonaventura Carenzi O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,808, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 102, and Page 152

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast