Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ippolito Antonio Cardinal Vincenti Mareri

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1738BornRieti, Italy
19 Mar 178547.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 178547.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
8 May 178547.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
20 Aug 178547.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
21 Feb 179456.0Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1794³56.8CeasedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
1 Jun 179557.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
3 Aug 180769.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
21 Mar 181173.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Antonio Vincenti Mareri
Ippolito Antonio Cardinal Vincenti Mareri (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
  • a cardinal for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1794
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 18
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016