Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Capelletti

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1762Born
2 Jun 178724.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 180038.1AppointedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
17 Aug 180038.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
26 Aug 180644.1AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
9 Dec 183169.4DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Capelletti
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Capelletti (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRieti

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 9
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 91, and Page 191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast