Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Bellini

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1740BornOsimo
11 Aug 180059.9AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
17 Aug 180059.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
23 Mar 180766.5AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
8 Sep 183191.0DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano Bellini:
Bishop Stefano Bellini (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 197, and Page 319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013