Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Vincenzo Monforte

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1733BornSorrento
24 May 177743.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 178652.9SelectedBishop of Tropea, Italy
18 Dec 178652.9ConfirmedBishop of Tropea, Italy
21 Dec 178653.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tropea, Italy
24 Oct 179763.8SelectedBishop of Nola, Italy
29 Jan 179864.1ConfirmedBishop of Nola, Italy
24 May 180268.4AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
15 Jun 180268.4DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Vincenzo Monforte:
Archbishop Giovanni Vincenzo Monforte (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 313, and Page 419
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016