Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Zangari

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1718Born
12 Sep 174526.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 178061.9AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
21 Sep 178061.9Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
31 Mar 179677.4DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Zangari
Bishop Carlo Zangari (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGatteo

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018