Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Arborio di Gattinara

Deceased

Bishop of Asti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1747BornAlbano Vercellese
21 Sep 177124.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 178841.3SelectedBishop of Asti, Italy
15 Sep 178841.7ConfirmedBishop of Asti, Italy
21 Sep 178841.7Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
12 Jan 180962.0DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Arborio di Gattinara:
Bishop Pietro Arborio di Gattinara (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 104
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014