Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Romoaldo Cardinal Braschi-Onesti

Deceased

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1753Born
18 Dec 178633.4Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jan 178733.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
2 Apr 180046.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
30 Oct 180047.2AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
10 Nov 180148.3ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
18 Jul 180753.9AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
30 Apr 181763.7DiedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}

MicroData Summary
Romoaldo Braschi-Onesti
Romoaldo Cardinal Braschi-Onesti
(born , died )
Archpriest of Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena, Diocese of Cesena, Italy

Relatives
  • a cardinal for 30.3 years

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1786

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025