Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Joseph Guitton

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1797Born
16 Jun 182123.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 184244.4SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
23 May 184244.5ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
29 Jun 184244.6Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
7 May 184951.5DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for André-Joseph Guitton (VIAF: 103216067)
Bishop André-Joseph Guitton (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAix-en-Provence

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018