Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Lafayette

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornEspinasse-Vozelle
29 Nov 162737.9AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
19 Mar 162838.2Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
3 May 167686.3DiedBishop of Limoges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Lafayette:
Bishop François de Lafayette (died ) Bishop of Limoges

  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 219
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015