Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal d’Aigrefeuille (Sr.), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1326²Born
19 Jan 134721.0AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
17 Dec 135024.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
17 Dec 135024.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Sep 136741.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
31 Oct 136842.8Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
4 Oct 136943.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume d’Aigrefeuille (Sr.)
Guillaume Cardinal d’Aigrefeuille (Sr.) O.S.B. (born 1326, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLafont (or Fontaines), Diocese of Limoges, France
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Death PlaceViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Most Holy Trinity, Church, Viterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Saint-Martial, Church, Limoges, Diocese of Limoges, France

  • a bishop for .9 years
  • a cardinal for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1350
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 May 2019

Quantcast